EP0299873 - Process for the preparation of aldehydes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOLLAC Immeuble Elysées-La Défense 29, le Parvis 92072 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states SOLLAC Immeuble Elysées-La Défense 29, le Parvis F-92072 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cordier, Jean 48 rue Henri Barbusse F 59880 Saint Saulve / FR | 02 /
Dussart, Bernard 4 rue du Contade F-67300 Schiltigheim / FR | 03 /
Castanet, Yves 29 allée de la Comédie F-59650 Villeneuve d'Asq / FR | 04 /
Melloul, Serge 12 Bis rue d'Esquermes F-59000 Lille / FR | 05 /
Petit, Francis 13 allée de la Clairière F-59650 Villeneuve d'Asq / FR | 06 /
Mortreux, André 17 rue Gambetta F-59150 Hem / FR | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Le Guen, Gérard, et al CABINET LAVOIX 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cédex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401835.9 | 13.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | FR19870010044 | 16.07.1987 Original published format: FR 8710044 | [1989/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299873 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299873 | Date: | 17.02.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C45/49, C07C47/06, C07C47/02 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
C07C45/49 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aldehyden | [1989/03] | English: | Process for the preparation of aldehydes | [1989/03] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'aldéhydes | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 07.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 19.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.02.1993 | DE | 17.02.1993 | ES | 17.02.1993 | GB | 17.02.1993 | GR | 17.02.1993 | IT | 17.02.1993 | NL | 17.02.1993 | SE | 17.02.1993 | BE | 31.07.1993 | CH | 31.07.1993 | LI | 31.07.1993 | LU | 31.07.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
DE | 17.02.1993 | ||
GB | 17.02.1993 | ||
GR | 17.02.1993 | ||
IT | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
BE | 31.07.1993 | ||
CH | 31.07.1993 | ||
LI | 31.07.1993 | ||
LU | 31.07.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
DE | 17.02.1993 | ||
GB | 17.02.1993 | ||
IT | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
BE | 31.07.1993 | ||
CH | 31.07.1993 | ||
LI | 31.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/38] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
DE | 17.02.1993 | ||
GB | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
BE | 31.07.1993 | ||
CH | 31.07.1993 | ||
LI | 31.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
DE | 17.02.1993 | ||
GB | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
CH | 31.07.1993 | ||
LI | 31.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 17.02.1993 | |
DE | 17.02.1993 | ||
GB | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | DE | 17.02.1993 | |
GB | 17.02.1993 | ||
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/40] | DE | 17.02.1993 | |
NL | 17.02.1993 | ||
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | NL | 17.02.1993 | |
SE | 17.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/36] | SE | 17.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59104329 ; | [Y]US4511741 (WEGMAN RICHARD W [US], et al); | [Y]US4513151 (WEGMAN RICHARD W [US], et al) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, 1984, page 698, résumé no. 191141h, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-59 104 329 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO., INC.) 16-06-1984, & JP59104329 A 00000000 |