EP0302776 - Tension device for the flexible or articulated element of a running or a transmission system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLMANT CUVELIER SOCIETE DITE : rue Greuze F-59000 Lille / FR | [1989/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Virly, Patrick route de Bouess Velles F-36330 Le Poinçonnet / FR | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Hud, Robert Cabinet COLLIGNON 15 rue de Surène 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Hud, Robert Cabinet COLLIGNON 15 rue de Surène F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88401973.8 | 29.07.1988 | [1989/06] | Priority number, date | FR19870011318 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: FR 8711318 | [1989/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302776 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/04, B62D55/30, B62D49/06, B62D55/125, B62D55/112 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
B62D49/0635 (EP,US);
B62D55/04 (EP,US);
B62D55/125 (EP,US);
B62D55/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | Spannvorrichtung für das Biegsame oder gelenkige Element eines Roll- oder Übertragungssystems | [1989/06] | English: | Tension device for the flexible or articulated element of a running or a transmission system | [1989/06] | French: | Dispositif tendeur pour l'élément souple ou articulé d'un système de transmission ou de roulement | [1989/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/41] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 19.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1992/21] | 29.12.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/21] | 03.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1991 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1035475 ; | [X]FR1216756 (LEO GERGEN); | [A]BE672231 ; | [A]US3452842 (BEXTEN EUGEN); | [A]US3752499 (BRANDSTADTER J); | [A]FR91932E (MESSIER FA); | [A]FR1514404 (MESSIER FA); | [AD]US2719062 (ARPS BRUNO F); | [A]BE661220 |