EP0356595 - Novel peptidase inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.1991 [1991/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | For all designated states MERRELL DOW PHARMACEUTICALS INC. 2110 East Galbraith Road, P.O. Box 156300 Cincinnati Ohio 45215-6300 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schirlin, Daniel 12 rue Jean-Jacques Rousseau Hoenheim F-67800 Bischheim / FR | 02 /
Pelton, John Tom 3, rue Murner F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
Tarnus, Céline 43, rue du 22 Novembre F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 04 /
Jung, Michel 3, Place Echauffour Engwiller F-67350 Pfaffenhoffen / FR | [1990/10] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/10] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402205.4 | 01.09.1988 | [1990/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0356595 | Date: | 07.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07K5/06, C07K5/08, C07K5/10, A61K37/00 | [1990/10] | CPC: |
C07D233/54 (EP);
C07K7/06 (KR);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C233/36 (EP);
C07C233/40 (EP);
C07C233/78 (EP);
C07C235/74 (EP);
C07C237/10 (EP);
C07C271/18 (EP);
C07C271/20 (EP);
C07C271/22 (EP);
C07C271/28 (EP);
C07C279/14 (EP);
C07K5/021 (EP);
C07K5/0227 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | FR [1990/10] | Title | German: | Peptidase-Hemmer | [1990/10] | English: | Novel peptidase inhibitors | [1990/10] | French: | Inhibiteurs des peptidases | [1990/10] | File destroyed: | 04.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 08.09.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/18] | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 03.10.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0187721 (DU PONT [US]); | [X]EP0275101 (MERRELL DOW PHARMA [US]) | [Y] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE USA, vol. 85, no. 18, September 1988pages 6612-6616; S. SEELMEIER et al.: "Human immunodeficiency virus has an aspartic-type protease that can be inhibited by pepstatin A" | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 23, 7th December 1987, page 274, abstract no. 214141y, Columbus, Ohio, US; L.H. PEARL et al.: "A structural model for the retroviral proteases", & NATURE (LONDON) 1987, 329(6137)351-4 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 107, no. 25, 21st December 1987, page 368, abstract no. 231968r, Columbus, Ohio, US; I. KATOH et al.: "Inhibition of retroviral protease activity by an aspartyl proteinase inhibitor", & NATURE (LONDON) 1987, 329(6140)654-6 | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 86, 1988, abstract no. 86065299, Philadelphia, PA., US; M. KOTLER et al.: "Synthetic peptides as substrates and inhibitors of a retroviral protease", & PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(US) 1988, vol. 85, no. 12p4185-4189 |