EP0309351 - Apparatus for working in a dust free environment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NOUVELLE D'EXPLOITATION LA CALHENE 1, rue du Petit Clamart F-78140 Velizy-Villacoublay / FR | [1989/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Picard, Claude 34, rue de Zilina F-92000 Nanterre / FR | [1989/13] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1989/13] | Application number, filing date | 88402386.2 | 22.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | FR19870013210 | 24.09.1987 Original published format: FR 8713210 | [1989/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309351 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309351 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B25J21/02, B01L1/04, F24F3/16 | [1989/13] | CPC: |
B01L1/04 (EP);
B25J21/02 (EP);
F24F3/163 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Arbeiten in staubfreier Umgebung | [1989/13] | English: | Apparatus for working in a dust free environment | [1989/13] | French: | Installation pour travaux hors poussière | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 31.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/44] | 14.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 04.09.1991 | IT | 04.09.1991 | NL | 04.09.1991 | BE | 30.09.1991 | CH | 30.09.1991 | LI | 30.09.1991 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 04.09.1991 | |
NL | 04.09.1991 | ||
BE | 30.09.1991 | ||
CH | 30.09.1991 | ||
LI | 30.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/37] | NL | 04.09.1991 | |
BE | 30.09.1991 | ||
CH | 30.09.1991 | ||
LI | 30.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | NL | 04.09.1991 | |
CH | 30.09.1991 | ||
LI | 30.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | NL | 04.09.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0195703 (CALHENE [FR]); | [Y]FR2366918 (USIFROID [FR]); | [A]FR1526935 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE); | [A]US4111753 (FOLSOM MAX H, et al) |