EP0312420 - Sauce having flavor like mayonnaise sauce and the method of the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 11.01.2002 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOKINO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 10-18, Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Sonoko 10-18 Takanawa 4-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/16] | Representative(s) | Viard, Jean Cabinet Madeuf-Viard 56A, Rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/16] | Viard, Jean Cabinet VIARD 28 bis, avenue Mozart F-75016 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402446.4 | 28.09.1988 | [1989/16] | Priority number, date | JP19870245990 | 30.09.1987 Original published format: JP 24599087 | [1989/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0312420 | Date: | 19.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0312420 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/24 | [1989/16] | CPC: |
A23L27/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/16] | Title | German: | Sauce mit einem Aroma wie Mayonnaisesauce und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1989/16] | English: | Sauce having flavor like mayonnaise sauce and the method of the production thereof | [1989/16] | French: | Sauce avec un arôme semblable à celui de la sauce mayonnaise et sa méthode de préparation | [1989/16] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 21.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.05.1994
30.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 / Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Sikken, Antonius H. J. M. Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.05.1994
30.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Sikken, Antonius H. J. M. Unilever N.V. Unilever Intellectual Property Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | ||
Former [1994/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.05.1994
30.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Sikken, Antonius H. J. M. UNILEVER N.V., Patent Division, P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | 22.06.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.10.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 31.10.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 21.11.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 30.11.1995 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.11.2001 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2002/09] | Appeal following opposition | 29.01.1996 | Appeal received No. T0074/96 | 27.03.1996 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.12.2000 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2000/53] | 28.02.2001 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2001/09] | 21.11.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 21.11.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE175334 ; | [Y]US3728133 ; | [A]DE1517113 ; | [A]GB1233043 | Examination | - Hess , Wiener Küche 1962 p 176,177,179,180,183,181 Lebensmittellexicon p 786 |