EP0311525 - Carton for bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1992 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS CH. WAUTERS ET FILS SOCIETE ANONYME: La Prairie de Villebon BP 32 F-91122 Palaiseau Cédex / FR | [1989/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wauters, Jacques Georges 56 Bd Rouget de Lisle F-93100 Montreuil / FR | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Vander-Heym, Serge Henri Marcel Cabinet Vander-Heym 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Vander-Heym, Serge CABINET R. VANDER-HEYM 172, Boulevard Voltaire F-75011 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402537.0 | 07.10.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | FR19870013971 | 09.10.1987 Original published format: FR 8713971 | [1989/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0311525 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0311525 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D5/44 | [1989/15] | CPC: |
B65D5/5273 (EP,US);
B65D5/38 (EP,US);
B65D5/46088 (EP,US);
B65D77/0426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/15] | Title | German: | Flaschenverpackung | [1989/15] | English: | Carton for bottles | [1989/15] | French: | Perfectionnements aux boîtes pour bouteilles | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | 21.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 28.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.10.1991 | [1992/21] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1413174 (S O L E C O S A SOC LIMOUSINE) |