EP0315549 - Protocol control circuit for data bus system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.09.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1995 | Refusal of application | published on 08.11.1995 [1995/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobatake, Syozo Kopo Saito 101-go, 1683, Kamikodanaka Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 02 /
Shirai, Hideaki Takei-so 3-go 449, Miyauchi Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | 03 /
Ohwada, Hideo 4-10-15, Sengen-cho Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183 / JP | 04 /
Yoshitomi, Koji Fujitsu Dai 6 Fujigaoka-ryo 17-15, Umegaoka Midori-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 227 / JP | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402786.3 | 04.11.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | JP19870280614 | 06.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28061487 | JP19870280615 | 06.11.1987 Original published format: JP 28061587 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315549 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315549 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04L11/16, H04L11/00 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
H04L12/2803 (EP,US);
H04L1/1835 (EP,US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L12/2838 (EP,US);
H04L12/282 (EP,US);
H04L2012/285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/19] | Title | German: | Protokollüberwachungsschaltung für Datenbussystem | [1989/19] | English: | Protocol control circuit for data bus system | [1989/19] | French: | Circuit de vérification de protocole pour système de bus de données | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 20.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1995/45] | 24.06.1995 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1995/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP62029238 ; | [A]JP60196048 ; | [A]JP57025748 ; | [A]JP61201529 ; | [X]US4536877 (LIVINGSTON WILLIAM D [US], et al); | [A]WO8401867 (NCR CO [US]); | [A]US4590467 (LARE LAWRENCE E [US]); | [A]EP0141659 (INMOS LTD [GB]) | [X] - FIFTEEN IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE COMPCON '77, Washington, 6th - 9th September 1977, pages 320-325, New York, US; M. TOKORO et al.: "Acknowledging ethernet"; Page 320, right-hand column, line 15 - page 321, left-hand column, line 22; page 322, right-hand column, line 7 - page 323, left-hand column, line 2. | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 204 (E-520)[2651], 2nd July 1987; & JP-A-62 029 238 (MITSUBISHI) 07-02-1987; The whole document., & JP62029238 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 39 (E-381)[2096], 15th February 1986; & JP-A-60 196 048 (FUJITSU K.K.) 04-10-1985; The whole document., & JP60196048 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 91 (E-109)[969], 28th May 1982; & JP-A-57 025 748 (FUJI DENKI SEIZO K.K.) 10-02-1982; The whole document., & JP57025748 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 33 (E-476)[2480], 30th January 1987; & JP-A-61 201 529 (NIPPON TELEGR. & TELEPH. CORP. (NTT) 06-09-1986; the whole document., & JP61201529 A 00000000 |