EP0319386 - Radiation stabilized fabric [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR, LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hudson, Robert L. 620 Springview Court Roswell, Georgia 30076 / US | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Sauvage, Renée Cabinet Sauvage 17, rue du Colonel Oudot 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Sauvage, Renée Cabinet Sauvage 100 bis, avenue de Saint-Mandé F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88402987.7 | 28.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | US19870127739 | 02.12.1987 Original published format: US 127739 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0319386 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0319386 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319386 | Date: | 28.07.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61L2/08, A61L15/00, D04H1/42, C08L23/12 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
D04H1/4291 (EP,US);
D04H3/007 (KR);
Y10T442/291 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/23] | D04H1/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | Gegen Ausstrahlungen stabilisierter Stoff | [1989/23] | English: | Radiation stabilized fabric | [1989/23] | French: | Etoffe rendue stable aux radiations | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/49] | 06.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.07.1993 | CH | 28.07.1993 | GR | 28.07.1993 | LI | 28.07.1993 | LU | 30.11.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/19] | AT | 28.07.1993 | |
CH | 28.07.1993 | ||
LI | 28.07.1993 | ||
Former [1994/05] | CH | 28.07.1993 | |
LI | 28.07.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3901848 (DIBATTISTA ANTHONY DOMINIC, et al); | [A]EP0048344 (AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]); | [Y]EP0198173 (HERCULES INC [US]) |