EP0319408 - Closing device forming a cap for a container, mould and method for making it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.10.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE MOULAGE AUTOMATIQUE (Société anonyme) Avenue de l'Europe Zone Industrielle F-02400 Château-Thierry / FR | [1989/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Corteggiani, Pierre 65, Rue des Fenouillères F-38170 Seyssins / FR | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Lerner, François, et al 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/23] | Lerner, François, et al 5, rue Jules Lefèbvre F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403020.6 | 30.11.1988 | [1989/23] | Priority number, date | FR19870016883 | 04.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8716883 | [1989/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0319408 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0319408 | Date: | 23.12.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/04, B29C45/44 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
B65D47/0847 (EP,US);
B29C45/4407 (EP,US);
B29L2031/565 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | Kappenförmiger Behälterverschluss sowie Form und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [1989/23] | English: | Closing device forming a cap for a container, mould and method for making it | [1989/23] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture pour récipient formant capsule, moule pour sa fabrication et son procédé de fabrication | [1989/23] | Examination procedure | 14.09.1989 | Examination requested [1989/45] | 02.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 23.12.1992 | ES | 23.12.1992 | GB | 23.12.1992 | GR | 23.12.1992 | IT | 23.12.1992 | NL | 23.12.1992 | SE | 23.12.1992 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | DE | 23.12.1992 | |
GB | 23.12.1992 | ||
GR | 23.12.1992 | ||
IT | 23.12.1992 | ||
NL | 23.12.1992 | ||
SE | 23.12.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | DE | 23.12.1992 | |
GB | 23.12.1992 | ||
IT | 23.12.1992 | ||
NL | 23.12.1992 | ||
SE | 23.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/48] | DE | 23.12.1992 | |
GB | 23.12.1992 | ||
NL | 23.12.1992 | ||
SE | 23.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/40] | DE | 23.12.1992 | |
NL | 23.12.1992 | ||
SE | 23.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | NL | 23.12.1992 | |
SE | 23.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/27] | NL | 23.12.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3675812 (FOSTER JOHN A); | [A]EP0201655 (SOMOVA SPA [IT]) | Examination | GB1360091 |