EP0320360 - Machine for the standard sizing of flitches to increase their value [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.1992 [1992/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henry, Gérard Lieu dit "La Coudraie" F-61190 Bubertre / FR | [1989/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/24] | Representative(s) | Sauvage, Renée Cabinet Sauvage 17, rue du Colonel Oudot 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/24] | Sauvage, Renée Cabinet Sauvage 100 bis, avenue de Saint-Mandé F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403076.8 | 06.12.1988 | [1989/24] | Priority number, date | FR19870016978 | 07.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8716978 | [1989/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0320360 | Date: | 14.06.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0320360 | Date: | 08.05.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B27C5/00, B27M1/08 | [1989/24] | CPC: |
B27C5/00 (EP);
B27C5/08 (EP);
B27M1/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bearbeiten von Schwartenkrettern auf Standardabmessungen zur Wertsteigerung | [1989/24] | English: | Machine for the standard sizing of flitches to increase their value | [1989/24] | French: | Installation de mise à dimensions standard des dosses en vue de leur valorisation | [1989/24] | File destroyed: | 21.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 09.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/31] | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.01.1992 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1794116 ; | [Y]US4519429 ; | [A]DE454742 ; | [A]FR1265736 ; | [A]FR2495045 ; | [A]US4372357 |