EP0321351 - Heat exchanger-radiator-absorber and solar collector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyevre, Nicolas 44, rue Voltaire F-92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | For all designated states Greaume, Francois 45 Avenue Jean Jaurès F-94110 Arcueil / FR | For all designated states Landler, Yvan 12 Boulevard Desgranges F-92330 Sceaux / FR | For all designated states Rocher, Philippe 5, rue Sainte Félicité F-75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states Vergnet, Marc 23, rue Jean Bleuzen F-92170 Vanves / FR | [1989/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/25] | Application number, filing date | 88403207.9 | 16.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | FR19870017794 | 17.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8717794 | [1989/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321351 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F24J2/24, F24J2/36, F24J2/46 | [1989/25] | CPC: |
B32B15/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/18 (US);
B32B27/065 (US);
B32B3/30 (US);
B32B5/18 (US);
F24S10/501 (EP);
F24S20/55 (EP);
F24S25/00 (EP);
F24S70/12 (EP);
F24S80/30 (EP);
F24S80/52 (EP);
F24S80/65 (EP);
B32B2307/302 (US);
B32B2311/30 (US);
F24S2025/6004 (EP);
F24S2025/6007 (EP);
F24S2025/601 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher-Heizkörper-Absorber und Sonnenkollektor | [1989/25] | English: | Heat exchanger-radiator-absorber and solar collector | [1989/25] | French: | Echangeur-radiateur-absorbeur et capteur solaire | [1989/25] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1990 | Examination requested [1992/12] | 17.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/03] | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.01.1990 | M01   Fee paid on   06.02.1990 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.1991 | 31.12.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4256087 (SOWERS CHARLES); | [AD]EP0070757 (CENTRE NAT ETD SPATIALES [FR]); | [AD]DE2747188 (VMW RANSHOFEN BERNDORF AG); | [AD]DE7927917U |