EP0321362 - Retinoic acid receptor and derivatives thereof, DNA encoding either substance and use of the proteins and of the DNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/25] | A novel steroid/thyroid hormone receptor-related gene, which is inappropriately expressed in human heptocellular carcinoma, and which is a retinoic acid receptor | ||
[1996/39] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.1997 [1997/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux 75715 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75715 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tiollais, Pierre 16 rue de la Glacière F-75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
Dejean, Anne 6 rue Nansouty F-75014 Paris / FR | 03 /
Blaudin de The, Hugues 28 rue Rambuteau F-75003 Paris / FR | 04 /
Marchio, Agnès 121 rue de Montreuil F-75011 Paris / FR | [1989/25] | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/25] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403229.3 | 16.12.1988 | [1989/25] | Priority number, date | US19870133687 | 16.12.1987 Original published format: US 133687 | US19870134130 | 17.12.1987 Original published format: US 134130 | US19880209009 | 20.06.1988 Original published format: US 209009 | US19880278136 | 30.11.1988 Original published format: US 278136 | [1989/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0321362 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0321362 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C12P21/02, C12Q1/68, C07K14/00 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/70567 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6876 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/25] | C12N15/00, C12P21/02, C12Q1/68, C07K13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/25] | Title | German: | Retinoesäurerezeptor und Derivate davon, beide Substanzen codierende DNS und die Verwendung der Proteine und der DNS | [1996/39] | English: | Retinoic acid receptor and derivatives thereof, DNA encoding either substance and use of the proteins and of the DNA | [1996/39] | French: | Récepteur de l'acide rétinoique et ses derivées, DNA codant pour ces deux substances et l'usage des protéines et des DNA | [1996/39] |
Former [1989/25] | Mit dem Steroid/Thyroid-Hormonrezeptor verwandtes Gen, das in menschlichen Leberzellkarzinomen ungeeigneter Weise exprimiert wird und das ein Rezeptor für Retinoesäure ist | ||
Former [1989/25] | A novel steroid/thyroid hormone receptor-related gene, which is inappropriately expressed in human heptocellular carcinoma, and which is a retinoic acid receptor | ||
Former [1989/25] | Gène relatif au récepteur des hormones stéroide/thyroide, étant exprimé d'une façon inappropriée dans le carcinome humain hépatocellulaire et étant un récepteur de l'acide rétinoique | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 20.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/08] | 29.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Request for further processing for: | 05.03.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 05.03.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.04.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0244221 (GENENTECH INC [US]) | [ ] - NATURE, vol. 330, 17th December 1987, page 667-670; H. DE THE': "A novel steroid thyroid hormone receptorrelated gene inappropriately expressed in human hepatocellular carcinoma" | [ ] - NATURE, vol. 333, 16th June 1988, pages 669-672; D. BENBROOK et al.: "A new retinoic acid receptor identified from a hepatocellular carcinoma" | [ ] - NATURE, vol. 332, 28th April 1988, pages 850-853; N. BRAND et al.: "Identification of a second human retinoic acid receptor" | [ ] - NATURE, vol. 322, 3rd July 1986, pages 70-72; A. DEJEAN et al.: "Hepatitis B virus DNA intergration in a sequence homologous to v-erb-A and steriod receptor genes in a hepatocellular carcinoma" | [ ] - NATURE, vol. 330, 3rd December 1987, pages 444-450; M. PETKOVICH et al.: "A human retinoic acid receptor which belongs to the family of nuclear receptors" | [ ] - NATURE, vol. 240, 13th May 1988, pages 889-895; R.M. EVANS: "The steroid and thyroid hormone receptor superfamily" | Examination | - SCIENCE, vol. 240, 13th May 1988, pages 889-895; R.M. EVANS: "The steroid and thyroid hormone receptor superfamily" |