EP0323779 - Dispensing closure for a fluid or viscous products, and container provided with such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1994 [1994/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gueret, Jean-Louis 15, rue Hégésippe-Moreau F-75018 Paris / FR | [1989/28] | Representative(s) | Peuscet, Jacques Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Peuscet, Jacques SCP Cabinet Peuscet et Autres, 68, rue d'Hauteville F-75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403241.8 | 19.12.1988 | [1989/28] | Priority number, date | FR19870018152 | 24.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8718152 | [1989/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323779 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323779 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/20, B65D47/06 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
B65D47/2006 (EP,US);
B65D47/065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1989/28] | Title | German: | Ausgabeverschluss für ein flüssiges oder pastöses Produkt sowie Behälter, versehen mit diesem Verschluss | [1989/28] | English: | Dispensing closure for a fluid or viscous products, and container provided with such a device | [1989/28] | French: | Capsule de distribution pour un produit fluide ou visqueux, et récipient équipé d'une telle capsule | [1989/28] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 21.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2156011 (BEIER GERHARD); | [Y]US3874568 (LA VANGE DONALD H, et al); | [YP]GB2194223 (OREAL); | [Y]CH528417 (LEEDS & MICALLEF [US]); | [A]US4487342 (SHY MIN C [TW]); | [A]US4711363 (MARINO MICHAEL [US]); | [A]EP0199673 (ALFATECHNIC AG [CH]); | [A]DE8707552U |