EP0323336 - Disposable make-up set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.03.1994 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | For all designated states L'OREAL 14, rue Royale F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gueret, Jean-Louis 15, rue Hégésippe-Moreau F-75018 Paris / FR | [1989/27] | Representative(s) | Michardière, Bernard, et al Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Michardière, Bernard, et al 7ter Boulevard Henri Ruel F-94120 Fontenay-sous-Bois / FR | Application number, filing date | 88403309.3 | 23.12.1988 | [1989/27] | Priority number, date | FR19870018295 | 29.12.1987 Original published format: FR 8718295 | [1989/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323336 | Date: | 05.07.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323336 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D40/24 | [1989/27] | CPC: |
A45D34/046 (EP,US);
A45D40/0087 (EP,US);
A45D40/24 (EP,US);
B65D75/32 (EP,US);
B65D75/5805 (EP,US);
B65D77/245 (EP,US);
Y10S206/823 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/27] | Title | German: | Wegwerfschminkset | [1989/27] | English: | Disposable make-up set | [1989/27] | French: | Ensemble de maquillage à utilisation unique | [1989/27] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.09.1992 | NL | 16.09.1992 | SE | 16.09.1992 | [1994/18] |
Former [1993/16] | NL | 16.09.1992 | |
SE | 16.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | NL | 16.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2547779 (RENYCK WALTER J); | [A]GB685054 (JOHN FOSTER); | [A]EP0078356 (OFTALYSINE SRL [IT]); | [A]GB2126890 (OFTALYSINE SRL); | [A]EP0171983 (COLE RODNEY DAVID) |