EP0291420 - Method of dosing with the aid of the average atomic number of phases containing a light element using a scanning microscope and an image analyser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1990 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PECHINEY 23, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | For all designated states PECHINEY 23, rue Balzac F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubus, Alain Chemin de Beauregard F-38500 Coublevie / FR | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Séraphin, Léon, et al PECHINEY 28, rue de Bonnel F-69433 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88420116.1 | 11.04.1988 | [1988/46] | Priority number, date | FR19870005562 | 13.04.1987 Original published format: FR 8705562 | [1988/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0291420 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N23/203 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
G01N23/203 (EP,US);
G01N23/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Dosieren durch Bestimmung der mittleren Atomzahl von ein leichtes Element enthaltenden Phasen mit einem Abtastmikroskop und einem Bildanalysator | [1988/46] | English: | Method of dosing with the aid of the average atomic number of phases containing a light element using a scanning microscope and an image analyser | [1988/46] | French: | Méthode de dosage à l'aide du numéro atomique moyen de phases contenant un élément léger à l'aide d'un microscope balayage et d'un analyseur d'images | [1988/46] | File destroyed: | 02.07.1996 | Examination procedure | 14.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 08.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.05.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2124759 (UNISEARCH LTD) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF MICROSCOPY, vol. 124, partie 1, octobre 1981, pages 57-68, the Royal Microscopical Society; M.D. BALL et al.: "The measurement of atomic number and composition in an SEM using backscattered detectors" |