EP0317451 - Electronic pulse generator for facial applicators, and method of producing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.07.1990 [1990/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klein, Oscar 401 Manatee Avenue West Holmes Beach Florida 33510 / US | For all designated states Demartini, Richard J. 8380 Vimerton Road 206 Largo Florida 34641 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states Klein, Oscar 401 Manatee Avenue West Holmes Beach Florida 33510 / US | ||
For all designated states Demartini, Richard J. 8380 Vimerton Road 206 Largo Florida 34641 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville B.P. 203 42005 St. Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Dupuis, François Cabinet Laurent et Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel-de-Ville, BP 203 F-42005 St. Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 88420380.3 | 15.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | US19870120920 | 16.11.1987 Original published format: US 120920 | US19880169492 | 17.03.1988 Original published format: US 169492 | [1989/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317451 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
A61N1/328 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/21] | Title | German: | Elektronische Impulserzeugungsvorrichtung für einen Gesichtsapplikator und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1989/21] | English: | Electronic pulse generator for facial applicators, and method of producing it | [1989/21] | French: | Dispositif électronique amélioré générateur d'impulsions pour applicateur facial et méthode de fabrication | [1989/21] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 27.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/28] | 13.02.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | GB349615 [ ]; | FR2502015 [ ]; | FR2307554 [ ]; | US4406658 [ ] |