EP0284531 - Control device for an outwardly pivoting leaf of a door or a window [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.1991 [1991/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FERCO INTERNATIONAL Usine de Ferrures de Bâtiment Société à responsabilité limitée 2, rue du Vieux-Moulin Reding F-57400 Sarrebourg / FR | [1988/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aumercier, Laurent 5, rue Princesse Henriette F-57370 Phalsbourg (Moselle) / FR | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Aubertin, François c/o Cabinet Innovations et Prestations SA 4, rue de Haguenau F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | Application number, filing date | 88440016.9 | 10.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | FR19870003597 | 12.03.1987 Original published format: FR 8703597 | [1988/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284531 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284531 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/16 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
E05F11/34 (EP,US);
E06B3/32 (KR);
E05D15/30 (EP,US);
E05F11/16 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/132 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/148 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/39] | Title | German: | Bedienungsvorrichtung für ein nach aussen schwenkbares Tür- oder Fensterblatt | [1988/39] | English: | Control device for an outwardly pivoting leaf of a door or a window | [1988/39] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'un ouvrant à pivotement vers l'exterieur d'une porte ou fenêtre | [1988/39] | Examination procedure | 12.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 12.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.05.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US1724011 (FLAGG LUCIEN M); | [A]US2585122 (HARTMAN RUSH S); | [A]US2709582 (CHAPMAN ARTHUR B); | [A]US3117351 (AHLGREN AXEL W); | [AD]GB2050498 (TRUTH INC) |