EP0305311 - Filing furniture with a revolving drum [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1993 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DACOTA SA Vacquiers F-31340 Villemur sur Tarn / FR | For all designated states Daigre, Jean Claude Vacquiers F-31340 Villemur sur Tarn / FR | [1989/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Daigre, Jean Claude Vacquiers F-31340 Villemur Sur Tarn / FR | [1989/09] | Representative(s) | Ravina, Bernard Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse 31700 Blagnac / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/09] | Ravina, Bernard Cabinet Bernard RAVINA 24, boulevard Riquet F-31000 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 88450032.3 | 05.08.1988 | [1989/09] | Priority number, date | FR19870011242 | 05.08.1987 Original published format: FR 8711242 | [1989/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0305311 | Date: | 01.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0305311 | Date: | 07.01.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A47B49/00 | [1989/09] | CPC: |
A47B49/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/09] | Title | German: | Möbel zum Ordnen mit drehender Trommel | [1989/09] | English: | Filing furniture with a revolving drum | [1989/09] | French: | Meuble de classement à tambour rotatif | [1989/09] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/42] | 31.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.11.1990 | 31.08.1992 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.10.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.01.1993 | GR | 07.01.1993 | [2000/04] |
Former [1994/25] | AT | 07.01.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1654458 (BRAUER & CO J K); | [A]FR2203137 (SCHUMM ERICH [DE]); | [X]US3889817 (BERKMAN JOSEPH L); | [X]GB1483056 (WEARING R, et al) |