EP0325887 - Production of fertilizer NP and NPK with NP slurry process achieving increased percentage of water solubility [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.1990 [1990/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHOSPHORIC FERTILIZERS INDUSTRY LTD. 97, Syngrou Ave. 11745 Athens / GR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For all designated states PHOSPHORIC FERTILIZERS INDUSTRY LTD. 97, Syngrou Ave. GR-11745 Athens / GR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Angelopoulos, George 83, 3rd Septemvriou Str. Athens / GR | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Metallinou-Gafou, Margarita 14, Sina Street 106 72 Athens / GR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | Metallinou-Gafou, Margarita 14, Sina Street GR-106 72 Athens / GR | Application number, filing date | 88600014.0 | 28.12.1988 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | GR19870002024 | 28.12.1987 Original published format: GR 872024 | [1989/31] | Filing language | EL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325887 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C05G1/00 | [1989/31] | CPC: |
C05B7/00 (EP);
C05B11/06 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C05B11/06, C05B11/08, C05B11/10, C05C1/00 (EP);
C05B7/00, C05B11/06, C05C1/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1989/45] |
Former [1989/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Produktion von NP- und NPK-Düngemitteln mit einem Aufschlämmverfahren mit erhöhtem Prozentsatz an Wasserlöslichkeit | [1989/31] | English: | Production of fertilizer NP and NPK with NP slurry process achieving increased percentage of water solubility | [1989/31] | French: | Procédé du type bouillie de fabrication d'engrais NP et NPK résultant en une augmentation du pourcentage de solubilité dans l'eau | [1989/31] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.01.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, ES, GR, LI, LU, SE | 05.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/39] | 03.05.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1990/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.04.1989 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.1989 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.1989 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.1989 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.1989 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.04.1989 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.03.1990 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3436205 ; | [Y]GB1147545 ; | [A]US3485580 ; | [A]FR1311532 ; | [A]FR710830 ; | [A]DE680101 ; | [A]BE526307 ; | [A]GB1048134 ; | [A]US3396003 ; | [A]FR998511 |