EP0288410 - A power jack and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.1989 [1989/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAGNON POWER JACK, INC. RR 1, P.O. Box 33 Great Bend Kansas 67530-0033 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states WAGNON POWER JACK, INC. RR 1, P.O. Box 33 Great Bend Kansas 67530-0033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagnon, Gerald E. RR. 1 P.O. Box 33 Great Bend Kansas 67530-0033 / US | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 88630069.8 | 21.04.1988 | [1988/43] | Priority number, date | US19870042057 | 24.04.1987 Original published format: US 42057 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0288410 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B66F3/12, B66F3/44 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
B66F3/44 (EP,US);
B66F3/08 (KR);
B66F3/12 (EP,US);
Y10S254/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/43] | Title | German: | Hebebock mit Motor und Verfahren zum Betrieb desselben | [1988/43] | English: | A power jack and method | [1988/43] | French: | Cric à moteur et procédé pour faire fonctionner celui-ci | [1988/43] | File destroyed: | 16.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 23.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/50] | 19.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/50] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3062504 (BLANCHARD HILARY P); | [A]CH462411 (WIEDERKEHR HANS [CH]); | [A]US3451655 (SCOTT LAWRENCE P); | [A]US4084830 (DANIEL JR JAMES A, et al); | [A]DE3104119 (FARZANEH ALI FARZAD); | [A]GB2149704 (SUN CHEMICAL CASCO DIV); | [A]US4653727 (CHANG SHOEI D [TW], et al) |