EP0311549 - Fast retrace circuit for a deflection amplifier in a cathode ray tube [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building 1, Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fazio, James Anthony, Sr. 16 Juniper Road Windsor Connecticut 06095 / US | [1989/15] | Representative(s) | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/15] | Waxweiler, Jean, et al Dennemeyer & Associates Sàrl P.O. Box 1502 L-1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 88630166.2 | 27.09.1988 | [1989/15] | Priority number, date | US19870101513 | 28.09.1987 Original published format: US 101513 | [1989/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0311549 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0311549 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G09G1/04, H01J29/70, H04N3/16 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
G09G1/04 (EP,US);
H03K4/696 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/15] | G09G1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/15] | Title | German: | Schnellrückschlag-Schaltung für einen Ablenkverstärker in einer Einrichtung mit einer Kathodenstrahlröhre | [1989/15] | English: | Fast retrace circuit for a deflection amplifier in a cathode ray tube | [1989/15] | French: | Circuit de retour de balayage rapide pour un amplificateur de déviation dans un dispositif à tube à rayons cathodiques | [1989/15] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 25.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.04.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/39] | 08.05.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/39] | Appeal following examination | 16.12.1993 | Appeal received No. T0228/94 | 01.03.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.07.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4677352 (SIBOVITS JACOB [US], et al); | [A]DE3107735 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]DE3046717 (RCA CORP [US]); | [A]US4675740 (BAFARO MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [A]US4490653 (OLMSTEAD HAROLD W [US]) |