EP0315574 - Renin inhibitors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleemann, Heinz-Werner, Dr. Jahnstrasse 6 D-6092 Kelsterbach / DE | 02 /
Urbach, Hans-Jörg, Dr. Le Lavandoustrasse 41 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 03 /
Ruppert, Dieter, Dr. Schreyerstrasse 30 D-6242 Kronberg/Taunus / DE | 04 /
Schölkens, Bernward, Dr. Hölderlinstrasse 62 D-6233 Kelkheim (Taunus) / DE | [1989/19] | Application number, filing date | 88710042.8 | 29.10.1988 | [1989/19] | Priority number, date | DE19873737498 | 05.11.1987 Original published format: DE 3737498 | DE19883818436 | 31.05.1988 Original published format: DE 3818436 | [1989/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0315574 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0315574 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07K5/02, C07K5/06, A61K37/64 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
C07K5/06191 (EP,US);
C07K7/14 (KR);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07F5/025 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | Renin-Inhibitoren | [1989/19] | English: | Renin inhibitors | [1989/19] | French: | Inhibiteurs de la rénine | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/20] | 15.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0145441 (DU PONT [US]); | [E]EP0354522 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [E]EP0293881 | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDINICAL CHEMISTRY, Band 28, Nr. 12, 1985, Seiten 1917-925, American Chemical Society; D.H. KINDER et al.: "Acylamino boronic acids and difluoroborane analogues of amino acids: Potent inhibitors of chymotrypsin and elastase" |