EP0286581 - Buccal administration of estrogens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state ???moredetails.lapse.edited??? ES | published on 14.01.2004 [2004/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZETACHRON, INC. Post Office Box 339, 100 North Science Park Road State College, PA 16803 / US | [1988/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keith, Alec D. 539 Beaumont Drive Boalsburg Pennsylvania 16801 / US | 02 /
Snipes, Wallace C. Deepwood Drive Pine Grove Mills Pennsylvania 16868 / US | [1988/41] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/41] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 88730081.2 | 08.04.1988 | [1988/41] | Priority number, date | US19870037273 | 10.04.1987 Original published format: US 37273 | [1988/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0286581 | Date: | 12.10.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0286581 | Date: | 05.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/565, A61K47/00, A61K9/20 | [1988/41] | CPC: |
A61K9/2031 (EP);
A61K31/565 (EP);
A61K31/567 (EP);
A61K9/006 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/41] | Title | German: | Buccale Verabreichung von Östrogenen | [1988/41] | English: | Buccal administration of estrogens | [1988/41] | French: | Administration buccale d'oestrogènes | [1988/41] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 28.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 16.11.1992 | [2004/03] |
Former [1995/26] | deleted | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 05.08.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2698822 (ALFRED HALPERN, et al); | [Y]US3009857 (GASSNER FRANCIS X); | [X]FR6955M ; | [YD]EP0107941 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]); | [XP]WO8704342 (KEY PHARMA [US]); | [YP]EP0232877 (ZETACHRON INC [US]) |