EP0281512 - Device and method for electrical-discharge machining [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine Zone industrielle de Satigny 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine Zone industrielle de Satigny CH-1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Girardin, Roger 8 chemin de l'Echarpine CH-1214 Vernier / CH | 02 /
Diot, Jean-Claude Les Grangettes Route du Bourg-Neuf F-74140 Douvaine / FR | [1988/36] | Representative(s) | Hugelin, Christiane 31, rue du Rhône 1204 Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/36] | Hugelin, Christiane c/o CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES SA Case postale 373 CH-1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | Application number, filing date | 88810042.7 | 27.01.1988 | [1988/36] | Priority number, date | CH19870000384 | 03.02.1987 Original published format: CH 38487 | [1988/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0281512 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B23H1/02, B23H1/10 | [1988/36] | CPC: |
B23H7/16 (EP,US);
B23H1/10 (EP,US);
B23H7/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/36] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur elektroerosiven Bearbeitung | [1988/36] | English: | Device and method for electrical-discharge machining | [1988/36] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour l'usinage par électroérosion | [1988/36] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 07.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/18] | 23.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/05] | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/05] | Request for further processing for: | 10.11.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 10.11.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   03.02.1990 | 31.01.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP60127920 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 286 (M-429)[2009], 13 novembre 1985; & JP-A-60 127 920 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.) 08.07.1985, & JP60127920 A 00000000 |