EP0285566 - Process for removing alkali and earth alkali metals from aluminium melts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alusuisse-Lonza Services AG Feldeggstrasse 4 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For all designated states ALUSUISSE-LONZA SERVICES AG Feldeggstrasse 4 CH-8034 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [1988/40] | For all designated states SCHWEIZERISCHE ALUMINIUM AG CH-3965 Chippis / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Ernst Galdistrasse CH-3945 Steg / CH | [1988/40] | Application number, filing date | 88810195.3 | 24.03.1988 | [1988/40] | Priority number, date | CH19870001209 | 30.03.1987 Original published format: CH 120987 | [1988/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0285566 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0285566 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22B21/06 | [1988/40] | CPC: |
C22B21/062 (EP,US);
C22B21/064 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [1988/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Alkali- und Erdalkalimetallen aus Aluminiumschmelzen | [1988/40] | English: | Process for removing alkali and earth alkali metals from aluminium melts | [1988/40] | French: | Procédé pour l'élimination de métaux alcalins et alcalino-terreux de bains d'aluminium | [1988/40] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 18.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/20] | 25.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR704792 (ALAIS & FROGES & CAMARQUE CIE); | [A]FR724553 (ALAIS & FROGES & CAMARQUE CIE); | [X]DE900391 (JOACHIM SEIBEL DR, et al); | [A]US3305351 (BYLUND LINTON D); | [X]DE2206722 (VAW VER ALUMINIUM WERKE AG); | [A]GB2041982 (MAGYAR ALUMINIUM); | [YD]GB2054396 (ALUSUISSE); | [A]AT367458B (VER GIESSEREIFORSCHUNG [AT], et al); | [X]EP0112024 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]); | [YD]EP0065854 ; | [A]EP0174074 (ALCAN INT LTD [CA]) |