EP0338178 - Multiple-use stick and its utilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schnydrig AG, Werkzeug- und Maschinenfabrik Industriestrasse CH-3700 Spiez / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | For all designated states Schnydrig AG, Werkzeug- und Maschinenfabrik Industriestrasse CH-3700 Spiez / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnydrig, Adolf Bubenbergstrasse 23B CH-3700 Spiez / CH | [1989/43] | Representative(s) | Steiner, Martin, et al c/o AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Steiner, Martin, et al c/o AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 CH-3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 88810253.0 | 21.04.1988 | [1989/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0338178 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0338178 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A45B9/00, A45B3/00, A63C11/22 | [1989/43] | CPC: |
A63C11/22 (EP);
A45B3/00 (EP);
A45B9/00 (EP);
A45B2009/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/43] | Title | German: | Universal-Stock und Verwendung desselben | [1989/43] | English: | Multiple-use stick and its utilisation | [1989/43] | French: | Bâton à usage universel et son utilisation | [1989/43] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES, GR, LU | 06.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/23] | 17.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.05.1989 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.1989 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.05.1989 | LU   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [2000/04] | GR | 26.01.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR472608 ; | [A]US1600046 (JACKSON GOLDWIN SAMUEL); | [A]FR1430274 (ASS OUVRIERS INSTR PRECISION); | [A]US3525532 (BALDSIEFEN WARREN); | [A]DE2140450 (WIMMER JOSEF); | [A]FR2214497 (SALMON GORDON [US], et al); | [A]FR2267808 (STAERK MARIA [FR]); | [A]CH598842 (KLEMM ERNST); | [A]DE2834260 (DSI SPORTARTIKEL); | [A]US4601246 (DAMICO FRANK M [US]); | [A]EP0191917 (LENHART KARL); | [A]DE8700848U |