EP0290394 - Improved hyraulic cement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 04.03.1992 [1992/10] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
CH
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 79539 Lörrach / DE | For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 1235 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For:BE
CH
ES
FR
GB
IT
LI
NL
SE
SANDOZ AG Lichtstrasse 35 CH-4002 Basel / CH | ||
For:DE
SANDOZ-PATENT-GMBH Humboldtstrasse 3 D-79539 Lörrach / DE | |||
For:AT
SANDOZ-ERFINDUNGEN Verwaltungsgesellschaft m.b.H. Brunner Strasse 59 A-1235 Wien / AT | |||
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states MAC MODERN ADVANCED CONCRETE S.P.A. Via Vicinale delle Corti I-31100 Treviso / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biagini, Stefano Via Casa di Ricovero 29 I-31100 Treviso / IT | 02 /
Collepardi, Mario Viale Felissent 50 I-31050 Treviso / IT | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1989/36] |
Former [1988/45] | D'haemer, Jan Constant Sandoz Technology Ltd. Patents and Trademarks Division CH-4002 Basle / CH | Application number, filing date | 88810279.5 | 03.05.1988 | [1988/45] | Priority number, date | GB19870010605 | 05.05.1987 Original published format: GB 8710605 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290394 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290394 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/04, C04B7/51, // (C04B28/04, 24:06, 24:22),(C04B28/04, 24:10, 24:22),(C04B28/04, 24:18, 24:22) | [1988/45] | CPC: |
C04B7/51 (EP);
C04B20/1022 (EP);
C04B20/1055 (EP);
C04B28/04 (EP);
C04B7/323 (EP);
C04B2103/22 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C04B20/1022, C04B7/02 (EP);
C04B20/1022, C04B7/14 (EP);
C04B20/1055, C04B7/02 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B24/06, C04B24/226, C04B40/0028, C04B40/06 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B24/10, C04B24/226, C04B40/0028, C04B40/06 (EP);
C04B28/04, C04B24/18, C04B24/226, C04B40/0028, C04B40/06 (EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Zement | [1988/45] | English: | Improved hyraulic cement | [1988/45] | French: | Ciment hydraulique | [1988/45] | Examination procedure | 05.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 14.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 04.05.1991 | [1992/10] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP54130496 ; | [A]FR506378 (LOUISVILLE CEMENT COMPANY [US]); | [AD]US2141571 (KENNEDY HENRY L, et al); | [A]FR1599676 ; | [Y]US4088808 (CORNWELL CHARLES E, et al); | [A]FR2396634 (PERLMOOSER ZEMENTWERKE AG [AT]); | [A]NL7805335 (NIPPON HOLLAND CEMENT B V); | [A]US4623682 (NICHOLSON RICHARD R [US], et al); | [YPD]WO8702978 (MODERN ADVANCED CONCRETE [IT]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 16, April 1980, page 337, no. 134168u, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-54 130 496 (TAKEMOTO OIL AND FAT CO.) 09-10-1979, & JP54130496 A 00000000 |