EP0300957 - Office chair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.1992 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EQUUS MARKETING AG Gupf CH-9038 Rehetobel / CH | [1991/14] |
Former [1989/04] | For all designated states EQUUS MARKETING AG Birli 85 CH-9044 Wald / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tobler, Peter Töbelimühlistrasse 6 CH-9424 Rheineck / CH | [1989/04] | Representative(s) | Riederer, Conrad A. c/o Riederer Hasler & Partner Patentanwälte AG Elestastrasse 8 Postfach 7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/04] | Riederer, Conrad A., Dr. Bahnhofstrasse 10 CH-7310 Bad Ragaz / CH | Application number, filing date | 88810300.9 | 06.05.1988 | [1989/04] | Priority number, date | CH19870002839 | 24.07.1987 Original published format: CH 283987 | [1989/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0300957 | Date: | 25.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0300957 | Date: | 31.07.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A47C7/00, A47C31/02 | [1989/04] | CPC: |
A47C7/40 (EP,US);
A47C31/02 (EP,US);
Y10S297/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/04] | Title | German: | Stuhl, insbesondere Büro- oder Arbeitsstuhl | [1989/04] | English: | Office chair | [1989/04] | French: | Chaise de travail | [1989/04] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 05.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 31.07.1991 | GR | 31.07.1991 | SE | 31.07.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1992/34] | GB | 31.07.1991 | |
SE | 31.07.1991 | ||
Former [1992/10] | SE | 31.07.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4390210 (WISNIEWSKI JOSEPH M, et al); | [AD]CH659179 (PROVENDA MARKETING AG); | [A]US4643480 (MORITA ISAO [JP]) |