EP0309392 - Mono- and dichloro-4,4'-diaminodiphenyl-5,5'-disulfonic acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 4002 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states CIBA-GEIGY AG Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4002 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Campbell, Colin Dennis, Dr. 1, Boghead Beith Ayrshire Scotland KA15 1DZ / GB | [1989/13] | Application number, filing date | 88810522.8 | 28.07.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | GB19870018798 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: GB 8718798 | [1989/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0309392 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0309392 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309392 | Date: | 02.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C309/29 | [1992/36] | CPC: |
C09B35/105 (EP,US);
C07C309/29 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/13] | C07C143/63 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/13] | Title | German: | Mono- und Dichlor-4,4'-diaminodiphenyl-5,5'-disulfonsäure | [1989/13] | English: | Mono- and dichloro-4,4'-diaminodiphenyl-5,5'-disulfonic acids | [1989/13] | French: | Acides mono- et dichloro-4,4'-diaminodiphényl-5,5'-disulphoniques | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 01.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR690112 ; | [A]DE47426 ; | [A]US2346941 (REYNOLDS WILLIAM B); | [A]FR1486851 (SANDOZ SA); | [XD]DE2260907 (SANDOZ AG) |