EP0299935 - A domestic oven window having a low temperature external surface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.02.1993 [1993/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAES GETTERS S.P.A. Via Gallarate, 215 I-20151 Milano / IT | [1989/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doni, Fabrizio Via Boncompagni, 36 Milano / IT | 02 /
Ferrario, Bruno Via B. Melzi, 146 Rescaldina Milano / IT | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 88830301.3 | 14.07.1988 | [1989/03] | Priority number, date | IT19870021337 | 17.07.1987 Original published format: IT 2133787 | [1989/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299935 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299935 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/04 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
F24C15/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1989/03] | Title | German: | Haushaltsofen mit einem Sichtfenster mit niedriger Temperatur an der Aussenoberfläche | [1989/03] | English: | A domestic oven window having a low temperature external surface | [1989/03] | French: | Fenêtre de four ménager comportant une surface extérieure à température basse | [1989/03] | Examination procedure | 13.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/26] | 11.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB429751 (GEORGE AUGUSTUS MOWER); | [Y]US2604886 (KING STUART F); | [Y]GB1015834 (MILLS PROD INC); | [A]US4048978 (PLUMAT EMILE, et al); | [A]GB2013874 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]EP0072396 (DEGUSSA [DE]); | [Y]EP0183559 (KENT HEATING LTD [NZ]) |