EP0296139 - Audio transducer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.1994 [1994/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HIGHWOOD AUDIO INC. 801-7th Avenue S.W. Calgary Alberta T2P 3S4 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | For all designated states HIGHWOOD AUDIO INC. 801-7th Avenue S.W. Calgary Alberta T2P 3S4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burton, Paul Nr. 104, 3600 Brenner Drive N.W. Calgary, Alberta T2L 1Y2 / CA | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Moberg, Sture V STURE V MOBERG AB Kungstensgatan 48 113 59 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/51] | Moberg, Sture STURE V MOBERG AB Kungstensgatan 48 S-113 59 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88850214.3 | 17.06.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | CA19870539976 | 18.06.1987 Original published format: CA 539976 | [1988/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0296139 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0296139 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04R9/06, H04R7/04, H04R7/24 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
H04R7/04 (EP,US);
H04R7/24 (EP,US);
H04R9/047 (EP,US);
H04R9/063 (EP,US);
H04R2440/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1988/51] | Title | German: | Tonwandler | [1988/51] | English: | Audio transducer | [1988/51] | French: | Transducteur audio | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 28.11.1991 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 29.01.1992 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request rejected | 17.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/17] | 25.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.10.1991 | M01   Fee paid on   14.11.1991 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1003608 (AKG AKUSTISCHE KINO GERAETE); | [Y]FR1407123 ; | [Y]DE3123098 (STUTE MARTIN); | [A]US1604788 (JOSEPH ROUND HENRY); | [Y]DE2608071 (PECHAL REINHARD ING GRAD); | [A]DE529819 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]GB346205 (LOUIS LUMIERE); | [A]US4472834 (YAMAMURO ISAO [JP], et al) |