EP0298944 - Method for releasing a warning device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.1991 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pattermann, Hannibal Vedahöjden 27 S-137 00 Västerhaninge / SE | [1989/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Billberg, Hans, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10 316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Billberg, Hans, et al Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB Box 10 316 S-100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 88850244.0 | 08.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | SE19870002823 | 09.07.1987 Original published format: SE 8702823 | [1989/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0298944 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0298944 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/08 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
G08B13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Warnvorrichtungsauslösungsverfahren | [1989/02] | English: | Method for releasing a warning device | [1989/02] | French: | Méthode pour déclencher un avertisseur | [1989/02] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/29] | 07.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1991/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.12.1990 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH86488 (VICTOR MANCEL [BE]); | [A]US3453613 (KAY MURRAY) |