EP0284590 - Method to realize a bobbin and method and device for seeking the yarn actuating such a bobbin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/39] | Bobbin and device for seeking the yarn actuating such a bobbin | ||
[1992/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1992 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Picanol N.V. Polenlaan 3-7 8900 Ieper / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | For all designated states Picanol N.V. Polenlaan 3-7 B-8900 Ieper / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waelkens, Joos Ter Olmen 13 B-8900 Ieper / BE | [1988/39] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/39] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 B-2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 88870041.6 | 10.03.1988 | [1988/39] | Priority number, date | BE19870000255 | 13.03.1987 Original published format: BE 8700255 | [1988/39] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0284590 | Date: | 28.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0284590 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H67/08, B65H55/00, D02H1/00 | [1988/39] | CPC: |
D02H1/00 (EP);
B65H55/00 (EP);
B65H67/086 (EP);
B65H2701/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1988/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren um Garnkörper auszuführen und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Suchen des Fadens auf dem Garnkörper | [1992/01] | English: | Method to realize a bobbin and method and device for seeking the yarn actuating such a bobbin | [1992/01] | French: | Procédé pour constituer des bobines, ainsi que procédé et dispositif pour rechercher le fil des bobines obtenues | [1992/01] |
Former [1988/39] | Garnkörper und Vorrichtung zum Suchen des Fadens auf demselben | ||
Former [1988/39] | Bobbin and device for seeking the yarn actuating such a bobbin | ||
Former [1988/39] | Bobine et dispositif de recherche de fil mettant en oeuvre une telle bobine | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 13.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.07.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 02.01.1992 | CH | 31.03.1992 | LI | 31.03.1992 | [1999/42] |
Former [1993/03] | CH | 31.03.1992 | |
LI | 31.03.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2226351 ; | [A]US3198446 ; | [A]US3352504 ; | [A]DE1943489 ; | [A]GB1074772 |