EP0296143 - Protection for holders receiving excrement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.1991 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRINA-CONTACT Société Privée à Responsabilité Limitée rue Américaine, 100 Ixelles B-1050 Bruxelles / BE | [1988/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dehaese, Brigitte Avenue Louis Jasmin, 109 Woluwé St Pierre B-1150 Bruxelles / BE | [1988/51] | Representative(s) | Claeys, Pierre, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Claeys, Pierre, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 B-1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [1988/51] | Vigneron, Jean Cabinet VIGNERON 30 avenue Eugène Godaux B-1150 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 88870100.0 | 31.05.1988 | [1988/51] | Priority number, date | BE19870000616 | 04.06.1987 Original published format: BE 8700616 | [1988/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0296143 | Date: | 21.12.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61G9/00 | [1988/51] | CPC: |
A61G9/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/51] | Title | German: | Schutz für Behälter zum Aufnehmen von Exkrementen | [1988/51] | English: | Protection for holders receiving excrement | [1988/51] | French: | Protection pour récipients destinés à recevoir les déjections | [1988/51] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 07.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 20.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/01] | 09.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3936890 ; | [X]US3591870 ; | [X]US3763502 ; | [XP]GB2196246 ; | [X]US4136798 ; | [X]US3906555 |