EP0308388 - Electrical heating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.1992 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.06.1992 [1992/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lefevere, Jules Rue Haute, 59 B-6338 Ligny / BE | [1989/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Overath, Philippe Cabinet Bede Boulevard Général Wahis 15 1030 Bruxelles / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Overath, Philippe Cabinet Bede, Place de l'Alma, 3 B-1200 Bruxelles / BE | Application number, filing date | 88870147.1 | 14.09.1988 | [1989/12] | Priority number, date | FR19870012681 | 14.09.1987 Original published format: FR 8712681 | [1989/12] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0308388 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H05B3/00 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
H05B3/009 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/12] | Title | German: | Elektrisches Heizgerät | [1989/12] | English: | Electrical heating apparatus | [1989/12] | French: | Appareil de chauffage électrique | [1989/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 30.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/35] | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2536236 ; | [X]FR2442409 ; | [XD]BE899045 ; | [A]FR1502839 ; | [A]WO8301720 ; | [A]EP0138314 ; | [A]US2379705 ; | [A]FR2504768 ; | [A]US2938101 |