EP0317541 - Method of remote control of several local stations by a central station and system for application of the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.1991 [1991/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TECO S.A. Rue Servais Malaise, 29 4030 Bois-de-Breux / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | For all designated states TECO S.A. Rue Servais Malaise, 29 B-4030 Bois-de-Breux / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bonameau, Jean-Marie Rue Servais Malaise, 29 B-4030 Bois-de-Breux / BE | [1989/21] | Representative(s) | Vanhamme, Joseph Louis Office Parette (Fred Maes) Avenue Gabrielle Petit, 2 7940 Brugelette / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/21] | Vanhamme, Joseph Louis Office Parette (Fred Maes) Avenue Gabrielle Petit, 2 B-7940 Brugelette / BE | Application number, filing date | 88870168.7 | 09.11.1988 | [1989/21] | Priority number, date | BE19870001302 | 17.11.1987 Original published format: BE 8701302 | [1989/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317541 | Date: | 24.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00, H04Q9/14 | [1989/21] | CPC: |
H04Q9/14 (EP);
H02J13/00009 (EP);
Y02B90/20 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S40/121 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fernsteuerung von mehreren lokalen Stationen durch eine zentrale Station und System zur Anwendung des Verfahrens | [1989/21] | English: | Method of remote control of several local stations by a central station and system for application of the method | [1989/21] | French: | Procédé de télécommande par un poste central d'une multitude de postes locaux et un système pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé | [1989/21] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 17.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/03] | 01.06.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/49] | 04.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2302653 (THEIMEG ELEKTRONIKGERAETE GMBH [DE]); | [Y]US4091361 (EICHELBERGER CHARLES W, et al); | [Y]FR2541052 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]); | [Y]US4680508 (RUCKI WILLIAM M [US]) | [Y] - WIRELESS WORLD, vol. 85, no. 1528, décembre 1979, pages 46-51; N. McARTHUR et al.: "The intelligent plug" |