EP0298953 - Half slide bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Miba Gleitlager Aktiengesellschaft Hauptstrasse 3 4663 Laakirchen / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | For all designated states MIBA Gleitlager Aktiengesellschaft Hauptstrasse 3 A-4663 Laakirchen / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lenhard-Backhaus, Hugo, Dipl.-Ing. Linzerstrasse 61 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | 02 /
Ehrentraut, Otto Sudetenplatz 1 A-4810 Gmunden / AT | 03 /
Haager, Ottmar Werkweg 3 A-4663 Laakirchen / AT | [1989/02] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/02] | Hübscher, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. Gerhard Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Helmut Hübscher Dipl.-Ing. Heiner Hübscher Spittelwiese 7 A-4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 88890178.2 | 06.07.1988 | [1989/02] | Priority number, date | AT19870001689 | 06.07.1987 Original published format: AT 168987 | [1989/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0298953 | Date: | 11.01.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0298953 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16C17/10 | [1989/02] | CPC: |
F16C17/10 (EP,US);
F16C43/02 (EP,US);
F16C2226/76 (EP,US);
F16C2300/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/02] | Title | German: | Gleitlagerhälfte | [1989/02] | English: | Half slide bearing | [1989/02] | French: | Demi-palier lisse | [1989/02] | Examination procedure | 14.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 23.09.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 18.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 18.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1386253 (VANDERVELL PRODUCTS LTD); | [X]GB2134189 (CLEVITE SRL); | [A]EP0192592 (COUSSINETS STE INDLE [FR]) |