EP0309438 - Automatic hand-gun [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Franz-Josefs-Kai 51 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [1989/13] | For all designated states STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Franz-Josefs-Kai 51 A-1010 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aigner, Friedrich, Ing. Raiffeisenstrasse 4/4 A-4300 St. Valentin / AT | [1989/13] | Application number, filing date | 88890231.9 | 06.09.1988 | [1989/13] | Priority number, date | AT19870002394 | 22.09.1987 Original published format: AT 239487 | [1989/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0309438 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0309438 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F41A15/00 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
F41A15/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/13] | F41C15/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/13] | Title | German: | Automatische Handfeuerwaffe | [1989/13] | English: | Automatic hand-gun | [1989/13] | French: | Arme portative automatique | [1989/13] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 06.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4438678 [ ] (RUGER WILLIAM B [US]); | US3394482 [ ] (BADALI JOSEPH A); | DE727308 [ ] (RHEINMETALL BORSIG AG) | Examination | - AR-15, M16, ASSAULT RIFLE HANDBOOK, Seiten 108,109, FIREPOWER PUBLICATIONS, 1985, Cornville, Arizona. |