EP0292535 - SOLID PHASE IMMUNOASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.1994 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KEMENY, David Michael 241 Kennington Road London SE11 6BY / GB | [1988/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/48] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | ||
Former [1988/48] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 88900078.2 | 04.12.1987 | [1988/48] | WO1987GB00878 | Priority number, date | GB19860029001 | 04.12.1986 Original published format: GB 8629001 | GB19870015226 | 29.06.1987 Original published format: GB 8715226 | GB19870015227 | 29.06.1987 Original published format: GB 8715227 | [1988/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804430 | Date: | 16.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0292535 | Date: | 30.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0292535 | Date: | 23.06.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/543, G01N33/52 | [1988/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/543 (EP);
G01N33/5302 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/48] | Title | German: | FESTPHASENIMMUNOASSAYVERFAHREN | [1988/48] | English: | SOLID PHASE IMMUNOASSAY | [1988/48] | French: | IMMUNO-ANALYSE EN PHASE SOLIDE | [1988/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/48] | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1991 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.03.1991 | 31.12.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 23.06.1993 | GB | 04.12.1993 | LU | 31.12.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1997/17] | SE | 23.06.1993 | |
GB | 04.12.1993 | ||
Former [1995/03] | SE | 23.06.1993 | |
GB | 04.12.1993 | ||
Former [1994/09] | SE | 23.06.1993 | Cited in | International search | FR2369557 [ ] (SQUIBB & SONS INC [US]); | EP0063810 [ ] (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]); | EP0132170 [ ] (BIO MERIEUX [FR]); | FR2556840 [ ] (IMMUNOTECH SA [FR]); | FR2599844 [ ] (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) |