EP0293493 - OPTICAL-MECHANICAL MEMORIZING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1991 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PROBLEM MODELIROVANIA V ENERGETIKE AKADEMII NAUK UKRAINSKOI SSR pr. Pobedy, 56 Kiev, 252680 / SU | [1988/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANTONOV, Alexandr Alexandrovich pr. Vernadskogo, 85-64 Kiev, 252142 / SU | 02 /
PETROV, Vyacheslav Vasilievich ul. Montazhnikov, 104 Kiev, 252069 / SU | 03 /
ZELINSKY, Alexandr Antonovich ul. Yakuba Kolasa, 6-231 Kiev, 252146 / SU | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Füchsle, Klaus, et al Hoffmann - Eitle ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88900263.0 | 05.11.1987 | [1988/49] | WO1987SU00124 | Priority number, date | SU19864157165 | 15.12.1986 Original published format: SU 4157165 | [1988/49] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804823 | Date: | 30.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293493 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293493 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 30.06.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/24 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
G11B25/02 (EP);
G11B7/0025 (EP);
G11B7/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/49] | Title | German: | OPTISCH-MECHANISCHE SPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [1988/49] | English: | OPTICAL-MECHANICAL MEMORIZING DEVICE | [1988/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MEMORISATION OPTO-MECANIQUE | [1988/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.1988 | Translation filed | 11.08.1988 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.1988 | Search fee paid | 11.08.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 21.08.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 09.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 30.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1990 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2151066 (LEY NIGEL GEOFFREY); | [YP]WO8704840 (AKAD NAUK SSSR [SU]) | International search | [A]GB1482668 (OKIKIOLU G); | [A]US4535434 (KISHI YOSHIO [JP]); | [A]EP0166199 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN [JP]) |