EP0390775 - A GRINDSTONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.1992 [1992/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OY PARTEK AB 21600 Parainen / FI | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | For all designated states OY PARTEK AB SF-21600 Parainen / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNDEN, Fred Ernholm SF-21660 Nagu / FI | 02 /
PALM, Carl-Olof Uudenmaankatu 4 D 84 SF-20500 Turku / FI | 03 /
NURMI, Toivo Puutarhakatu 24 SF-21600 Parainen / FI | 04 /
KEPPO, Martti Torpparintie 9 SF-02180 Espoo / FI | [1990/41] | Representative(s) | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/41] | Geldard, David Guthrie, et al URQUHART-DYKES AND LORD Tower House Merrion Way Leeds West Yorkshire LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88900370.3 | 15.12.1987 | [1990/41] | WO1987FI00169 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8905712 | Date: | 29.06.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0390775 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.06.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 29.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/12 | [1990/41] | CPC: |
B24D18/0009 (EP);
B24D3/12 (EP);
B24D3/346 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/41] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFSTEIN | [1990/41] | English: | A GRINDSTONE | [1990/41] | French: | MEULE | [1990/41] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.1990 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 07.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/41] | 01.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/53] | 04.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4588443 (BACHE HANS H [DK]) | [A] - C.A. Vol. 95 (1981):137231g |