EP0299006 - TILTABLE TRAILER FOR MOTOR VEHICLES, ESPECIALLY PRIVATE CARS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.1992 [1992/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SYSTEMVAGNAR AB Hansellisgatan 6 S-754 50 Uppsala / SE | [1989/31] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states SYSTEMVAGNAR AB Hansellisgatan 6 S-754 50 Uppsala / SE | ||
For all designated states PIHLSTRÖM, Bernt Blockvägen 25 C S-824 00 Hudiksvall / SE | |||
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states PIHLSTRÖM, Anund Kolonivägen 11 B S-824 00 Hudiksvall / SE | ||
For all designated states PIHLSTRÖM, Bernt Blockvägen 25 C S-824 00 Hudiksvall / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pihlström, Anund Kolonivägen 11 B S-824 00 Hudiksvall / SE | 02 /
Pihlström, Bernt Blockvägen 25 C S-824 00 Hudiksvall / SE | [1989/31] |
Former [1989/03] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Kummelsten, Per Arne, et al UPPSALA PATENTBYRA P.O. Box 9013 750 09 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Kummelsten, Per-Arne, et al UPPSALA PATENTBYRA P.O. Box 9013 S-750 09 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 88900606.0 | 21.12.1987 | [1989/03] | WO1987SE00621 | Priority number, date | SE19860005554 | 23.12.1986 Original published format: SE 8605554 | [1989/03] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804618 | Date: | 30.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299006 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 30.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60P1/32, B60P1/64, B60P3/42, B62D63/06 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
B62D63/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/03] | Title | German: | KIPPANHÄNGER FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE, INSBESONDERE PERSONENWAGEN | [1989/03] | English: | TILTABLE TRAILER FOR MOTOR VEHICLES, ESPECIALLY PRIVATE CARS | [1989/03] | French: | REMORQUE BASCULANTE POUR VEHICULES A MOTEUR, AUTOMOBILES DE TOURISME EN PARTICULIER | [1989/03] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1988 | Translation filed | 25.10.1988 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/13] | 06.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/52] | 31.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.09.1988 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | LU   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | 23.09.1988 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   25.10.1988 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.01.1992 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3578190 (MAY JOE C, et al); | [X]US3584753 (VOELLER EDWARD A); | [X]FR2391090 (DAMORAN JEAN [FR]); | [Y]SE408875 (VALMET OY [FI]); | [Y]SE422556 (NYA TRANESLEPET AB [SE]); | [Y]GB2152478 (PRATT STEPHEN CLIFFORD); | [Y]EP0162292 (JAGERS LEOPOLD); | [X]DE3437854 (GEROH MECHANISCHE SYSTEME [DE]) |