EP0373160 - DIVERGENT TRAILING-EDGE AIRFOIL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states McDONNELL DOUGLAS CORPORATION 3855 Lakewood Boulevard Long Beach, CA 90846 / US | [1990/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNE, Preston, A. 14 Fortuna W. Irvine, CA 92714 / US | 02 /
GREGG, Robert, D., III 1854 Somerset Lane Fullerton, CA 92633 / US | [1990/46] |
Former [1990/25] | 01 /
HENNE, Preston, A. 14 Fortuna W. Irvine, CA 92714 / US | ||
02 /
GREGG, Robert, D., III 2665 W. Greenleaf Anaheim, CA 92801 / US | Representative(s) | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | Baillie, Iain Cameron, et al c/o Ladas & Parry Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88900630.0 | 08.12.1987 | [1990/25] | WO1987US03260 | Priority number, date | US19870056250 | 01.06.1987 Original published format: US 56250 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809745 | Date: | 15.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0373160 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373160 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B64C3/14 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
B64C3/14 (EP,US);
B64C2003/149 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1991/11] |
Former [1990/25] | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | FLÜGELFLÄCHE MIT EINER DIVERGIERENDEN HINTERKANTE | [1990/25] | English: | DIVERGENT TRAILING-EDGE AIRFOIL | [1990/25] | French: | PROFIL D'AILE A BORD DE FUITE DIVERGENT | [1990/25] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.1989 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed | 30.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 13.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US1893064 [ ] (ZAPARKA EDWARD F); | US4314795 [ ] (DADONE LEONE U); | US4542868 [ ] (BOYD JAMES A [US]) | Examination | - JOURNAL OF AIRCRAFT, VOLUME 15, NO. 9, SEPTEMBER 1978, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF AERONAUTICS AND ASTRONAUTICS, (US), R.H. LIEBECK: "DESIGN OF SUBSONIC AIRFOILS FOR HIGH LIFT", PAGES 547-561 SEE PAGE 559, RIGHT-HAND COLUMN, LINE 19 - PAGE 560, LEFT-HAND COLUMN, LINE 39; FIGURES 29-31 |