EP0299016 - DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING PRODUCTS TRANSPORTED BY A CONVEYOR BELT AND METHOD FOR USING SUCH DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAPAL, Société Anonyme des Plieuses Automatiques 44, Av. du Tir Fédéral 1024 Ecublens / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | For all designated states SAPAL, Société Anonyme des Plieuses Automatiques 44, Av. du Tir Fédéral CH-1024 Ecublens / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GILGIEN, Willy En Lévremont CH-1143 Apples / CH | [1989/03] | Representative(s) | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Moser & Cie C/o Cabinet Roland Nithardt Y-Parc/Chemin de la Sallaz 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1989/03] | Nithardt, Roland Cabinet Moser & Cie, c/o Cabinet Roland Nithardt, Y-Parc/Chemin de la Sallaz CH-1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | Application number, filing date | 88900806.6 | 27.01.1988 | [1989/03] | WO1988CH00016 | Priority number, date | FR19870001039 | 27.01.1987 Original published format: FR 8701039 | [1989/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805417 | Date: | 28.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0299016 | Date: | 18.01.1989 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0299016 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65G43/08, B65G47/32 | [1989/03] | CPC: |
B65G17/26 (EP,US);
B65G43/08 (EP,US);
B65G47/082 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM TRANSPORT VON STÜCKGUT AUF EINER FÖRDERBAHN | [1989/03] | English: | DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING PRODUCTS TRANSPORTED BY A CONVEYOR BELT AND METHOD FOR USING SUCH DEVICE | [1989/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE PRODUITS TRANSPORTES PAR UN CONVOYEUR AINSI QU'UN PROCEDE POUR UTILISER CE DISPOSITIF | [1989/03] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.1988 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/03] | 17.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.03.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 25.09.1991 | [1999/42] | Cited in | International search | FR2259750 [ ] (PONT A MOUSSON [FR]); | GB2003441 [ ] (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES); | FR2492783 [ ] (WINDMOELLER & HOELSCHER [DE]); | EP0187424 [ ] (STANDARD KNAPP INC [US]) |