EP0332660 - BIOADHESIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Enzon Labs Inc. 40 Kingsbridge Road Piscataway New Jersey 08854 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states Enzon Labs Inc. 40 Kingsbridge Road Piscataway New Jersey 08854 / US | ||
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states GENEX CORPORATION 16020 Industrial Drive Gaithersburg Maryland 20877 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAUGH, Kathy J. 20900 Quail Drive Walnut, CA 91789 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, David M. 13509 Bailey Drive Rockville, MD 20850 / US | 03 /
STRAUSBERG, Robert 2815 Hathaway Terrace Silver Spring, MD 20906 / US | 04 /
STRAUSBERG, Susan L. 2815 Hathaway Terrace Silver Spring, MD 20906 / US | 05 /
MCCANDLISS, Russ 939 Pointer Ridge Drive Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US | 06 /
WEI, Tena 3 Sussex Court Rockville, MD 20854 / US | 07 /
FILPULA, David 17022 King James Way Gaithersburg, MD 20877 / US | [1989/38] | Representative(s) | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory, et al Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | ||
Former [1989/38] | Sheard, Andrew Gregory Kilburn & Strode 30, John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 88900964.3 | 24.11.1987 | [1989/38] | WO1987US03048 | Priority number, date | US19860933945 | 24.11.1986 Original published format: US 933945 | US19870082456 | 07.08.1987 Original published format: US 82456 | [1989/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803953 | Date: | 02.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332660 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12N15/00, C12N1/18, C12N1/20 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
C12N9/6481 (EP);
C07K14/435 (EP);
C09J189/00 (EP);
C12N15/71 (EP);
C12N15/81 (EP);
C12N9/16 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/38] | Title | German: | BIOKLEBEMITTEL | [1989/38] | English: | BIOADHESIVES | [1989/38] | French: | BIOADHESIFS | [1989/38] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.1989 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.1989 | Search fee paid | 24.05.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 24.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 29.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 26.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/50] | 13.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | EP0244688 [ ]; | US4496397 [ ]; | EP0242656 [ ] | [AD] - THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 258, no. 5, 10th March 1983, pages 2911-2915, US; J.H. WAITE: "Evidence for repeating 3,4-dihydroxyphenylalanine- and hydroxyproline-containing decapeptide in the adhesive protein of the mussel, mytilus edulis L" | [A] - BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA 1986, vol. 872, nos. 1-2, 1986, pages 98-103; K. MARUMO et al.: "Optimization of hydroxylation of tyrosine and tyrosine-containing peptides by mushroom tyrosinase" | [X] - SCIENCE, vol. 212, 29th May 1981, pages 1038-1040, AAAS; J.H. WAITE et al.: "Polyphenolic substance of Mytilus edulis: Novel adhesive containing L-dopa and hydroxyproline" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 105, no. 21, 24th November 1985, abstract no. 186489f, Columbus, Ohio, US; K. MARUMO et al.: "Optimization of hydroxylation of tyrosine and tyrosine-containing peptides by mushroom tyrosinase", & BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA 1986, 872(1-2), 98-103 | [A] - GENETIC ENGINEERING NEWS, 14th April 1985; R. JOHNSON: "Genex seeks to clone mussel glue protein" | International search | US4687740 [ ]; | US4585585 [ ]; | US4496397 [ ]; | JPS6485400 [ ] | [Y] - Abstracts of the Annual Meetings of the American Society for Microbiology, Volume 83, issued 1983, G.M. THORNE et al, "Cloning of Adhesive Antigen Serotype 3 from Enterotoxigenic E. Coli Strain D542," see page 60. | [Y] - Genetic Engineering News, issued April 1985, R. JOHNSON, "Genex Seeks to Clone Mussel Glue Protein", see pages 14 and 18. |