EP0344182 - ELECTRIC GANG-TYPE CAPACITOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1990 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.1991 [1991/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEHMUS, Helmut Weinmeisterhornweg 30 D-1000 Berlin 30 / DE | [1989/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Christiansen, Henning Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louise-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45 D-14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 88901224.1 | 27.01.1988 | [1989/49] | WO1988DE00041 | Priority number, date | DE19873702663 | 27.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3702663 | [1989/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8805597 | Date: | 28.07.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344182 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/38, H01G4/40, H03H1/00 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
H01G4/35 (EP);
H01G4/38 (EP,KR);
H01G4/40 (EP);
H03H1/0007 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE MEHRFACHKONDENSATORANORDNUNG | [1989/49] | English: | ELECTRIC GANG-TYPE CAPACITOR SYSTEM | [1989/49] | French: | MONTAGE ELECTRIQUE DE CONDENSATEURS JUMELES | [1989/49] | File destroyed: | 03.07.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 25.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/49] | 01.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/05] | 04.09.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2940058 [ ] (FOSTER JAMES H); | DE2925374 [ ] (TAIYO YUDEN KK) |