EP0302100 - IMPROVED PHASE LOCK LOOP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/33] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O. Box 45066 Los Angeles, California 90045-0066 / US | ||
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states Hughes Aircraft Company 7200 Hughes Terrace P.O.Box 45066 Los Angeles California 90045-0066 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KINKEL, John, F. 10 Ninos Irvine, CA 92720 / US | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 88902033.5 | 05.02.1988 | [1989/06] | WO1988US00344 | Priority number, date | US19870014580 | 13.02.1987 Original published format: US 14580 | [1989/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8806383 | Date: | 25.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302100 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0302100 | Date: | 21.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H03L7/12 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
H03L7/12 (EP,KR,US);
H03L7/093 (KR);
Y10S331/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/06] | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE PHASENREGELSCHLEIFE | [1989/06] | English: | IMPROVED PHASE LOCK LOOP | [1989/06] | French: | BOUCLE DE BLOCAGE DE PHASE AMELIOREE | [1989/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1988 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 09.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 21.04.1993 | SE | 21.04.1993 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 21.04.1993 | |
SE | 21.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/52] | SE | 21.04.1993 | Cited in | International search | US4007429 [ ] (CADALORA FULVIO, et al); | DE2812377 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | GB2097618 [ ] (RCA CORP) |