EP0303714 - METHOD OF GENERATING FREE POSITRONIUM RADIANT LIGHT AND APPARATUS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.09.1995 [1995/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IKEGAMI, Hidetsugu 12-50, Hibarigaoka 2-chome Takarazuka-shi, Hyogo 665 / JP | [1989/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/08] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/08] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88902199.4 | 24.02.1988 | [1989/08] | WO1988JP00191 | Priority number, date | JP19870039053 | 24.02.1987 Original published format: JP 3905387 | [1989/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8806812 | Date: | 07.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0303714 | Date: | 22.02.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0303714 | Date: | 14.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.09.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/30, H05G2/00, H05H13/04, H05H13/10 | [1994/37] | CPC: |
H01S4/00 (EP,US);
Y10S376/913 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/08] | H01S3/30 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1989/08] | Title | German: | METHODE UND ANLAGE ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON LICHTSTRAHLUNG AUS FREIEM POSITRONIUM | [1989/08] | English: | METHOD OF GENERATING FREE POSITRONIUM RADIANT LIGHT AND APPARATUS THEREFOR | [1989/08] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DE PRODUCTION DE LUMIERE POSITRONIQUE RADIANTE LIBRE | [1989/08] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.1988 | Translation filed | 21.10.1988 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.1988 | Search fee paid | 21.10.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/14] | 10.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2057749 (MONARO RESEARCH LAB PTY LTD) | International search | [A]JPH05694681 ; | [A]JPS56124282 (US GOVERNMENT [US]); | [A]JPH05457989 ; | [A]JPH05619692 ; | [A]US4529942 (PATEL CHANDRA K N [US], et al); | [A]US4479218 (BRAU CHARLES A [US], et al) |