EP0394229 - BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.1990 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1991 | Change - miscellaneous | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKAGAMI, Toshinori 11-24, 2-chome Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
TOYAMA, Yasuo 11-24, 2-chome Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
ITO, Hisaharu 11-24, 2-chome Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
MIYACHI, Takumi 11-24, 2-chome Tsukiji, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1990/44] | Representative(s) | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 2501 AN Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/44] | Aalbers, Onno, et al P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 88902447.7 | 04.03.1988 | [1990/44] | WO1988EP00176 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8908128 | Date: | 08.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0394229 | Date: | 31.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08L53/02, C09J3/14 | [1990/44] | CPC: |
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08F297/046 (EP,US);
C08G81/022 (EP,US);
C09J153/02 (EP,US);
C08L2666/24 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L53/02, C08L2666/24 (EP,US);
C09J153/02, C08L2666/24 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/44] | Title | German: | BLOCKCOPOLYMERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1990/44] | English: | BLOCK COPOLYMER COMPOSITION | [1990/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DE COPOLYMERE BLOC | [1990/44] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1991/33: Verfahren abgeschlossen infolge Verbindung mit 88200423.7/0330764 (europäische Anmeldenummer/Veröffentlichungsnummer) vom 01.07.91 | EPB 1991/33: Proceedings concluded following consolidation with 88200423.7/0330764 (European application No./publication No.) by decision dated 01.07.91 | EPB 1991/33: Procédure close par suite de la jonction avec la demande no. 88200423.7/0330764 (numéro de dépôt/numéro de publication de la demande européenne) par décision du 01.07.91 | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.1989 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.1989 | Examination requested [1990/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR2352045 [ ] (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [US]); | FR2352028 [ ] (JOHNSON & JOHNSON [US]); | US3519585 [ ] (MILLER JAMES A); | EP0238135 [ ] (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) |