EP0379479 - SECURITY AND CONTROL SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.1994 [1994/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEWTRONICS SA 3 Rue Nicolas Adames L-1114 Luxembourg / LU | [1993/35] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states SWADLING, Roger David 35 Lyefield Road West Charlton Kings Cheltenham Gloucestershire / GB | ||
For all designated states MALONEY, Conrad Raymond Crewe Flat 3, Pembury House Lansdown Crescent Montpellier Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 2JX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/31] | Representative(s) | Gallafent, Richard John, et al Gallafents Ltd The Old Vicarage Stanbridge, Bedfordshire LU7 9HX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | Gallafent, Richard John, et al GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WCIV 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 88902519.3 | 16.03.1988 | [1990/31] | WO1988GB00204 | Priority number, date | GB19870006154 | 16.03.1987 Original published format: GB 8706154 | [1990/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8807119 | Date: | 22.09.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379479 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.09.1988 | Classification | IPC: | E05B49/00, G07C9/00 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
G07C9/00571 (EP);
E05B49/00 (KR);
G07C9/21 (EP,KR,US);
G07C9/00904 (EP);
G07C9/27 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/10] |
Former [1990/31] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | SICHERHEITS- UND KONTROLLSYSTEME | [1990/31] | English: | SECURITY AND CONTROL SYSTEMS | [1990/31] | French: | SYSTEMES DE SECURITE ET DE COMMANDE | [1990/31] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.1989 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 14.09.1989 | Examination requested [1990/31] | 19.10.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | 16.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/26] | 02.02.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 05.06.1990 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.1990 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.1990 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.1990 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.1990 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.1990 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 05.06.1990 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1994 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4002842 [ ] (MEYR HEINI, et al); | US4148092 [ ] (MARTIN RICKY); | GB2069582 [ ] (BRITISH RELAY ELECTRONICS LTD); | GB2153896 [ ] (LINDOP DAVID HARRY) |